This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 15:53:42 (UTC).

HAROUT SAYADYAN VS WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 HAROUT SAYADYAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM F. FAHEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2180

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SAYADYAN HAROUT

Defendant

WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHY KENNETH R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/17/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

11/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR DEPARTMENT 69 ONLINE COURTROOM INFORMATION

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/16/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/22/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Case Management Statement

3/10/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

3/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Order - Dismissal

3/28/2022: Order - Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...) OF 03/28/2022

3/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...) OF 03/28/2022

Notice of Settlement

3/22/2022: Notice of Settlement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...) of 03/28/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Harout Sayadyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Harout Sayadyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Harout Sayadyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 69, William F. Fahey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Department 69 Online Courtroom Information); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harout Sayadyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harout Sayadyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harout Sayadyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHY KENNETH RAY