Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2021 at 18:32:47 (UTC).

HAROLD LANCER, MD, ET AL. VS CAPITAL GROUP BANK & TRUST COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/18/2020 HAROLD LANCER, MD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAPITAL GROUP BANK TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS and MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3172

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANCER FAMILY FOUNDATION

HAROLD LANCER M.D. A.M.C. PROFIT SHARING PLAN

LANCER HAROLD MD

HAROLD LANCER M.D. A.M.C. DEFINED BENEFIT PENSION PLAN

Defendants

CAPITAL GROUP BANK & TRUST COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 20 INCLUSIVE

SANDLER SCOTT MITCHELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRECHT CELESTE M

Defendant Attorney

CROWTHER ROBYN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docketat 2:37 PM in Department 62, Michael L. Stern, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 09/18/2020, Final Trial Preparation); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Capital Group Bank & Trust Company (Defendant); Scott Mitchell Sandler (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Defined Benefit Pension Plan (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Defined Benefit Pension Plan (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Plaintiff's 170.6 CCP Challenge;) of 07/01/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Plaintiff's 170.6 CCP Challenge;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) (as to Judge Maureen Duffy-Lewis); Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Defined Benefit Pension Plan (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Profit Sharing Plan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Defined Benefit Pension Plan (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Defined Benefit Pension Plan (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Harold Lancer, MD (Plaintiff); Harold Lancer, M.D., A.M.C. Defined Benefit Pension Plan (Plaintiff); Lancer Family Foundation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROWTHER ROBYN