This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 20:49:21 (UTC).

HARGITAY, ELLEN VS GIORDANO, ROBERT SANTOS

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 HARGITAY, ELLEN filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against GIORDANO, ROBERT SANTOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PELLMAN, AMY M. and BOXER, DOREEN B.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0851

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PELLMAN, AMY M.

BOXER, DOREEN B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HARGITAY ELLEN

Respondent

GIORDANO ROBERT SANTOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARDOSO TANIA KIM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

3/9/2022: Minute Order

Proof of Service - Re: Ntc of Hearing, etc.

3/2/2022: Proof of Service - Re: Ntc of Hearing, etc.

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

2/16/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

2/16/2022: Petition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/16/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

2/16/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/16/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/9/2022: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

4/1/2022: Minute Order

Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

4/1/2022: Stipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Boxer, Doreen B., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 25, Pellman, Amy M., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Not Held - Continued by Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Re: Ntc of Hearing, etc. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketPetition - Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF HOLLENBECK & CARDOSO, LLP - TANIA CARDOSO