This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/28/2023 at 08:35:34 (UTC).

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY, INCORPORATED, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY, INCORPORATED,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0032

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARCO NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

GENESYS AEROSYSTEMS GROUP INC.

MOOG INC.

ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INCORPORATED

S-TEC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEYERS DANA N

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. STRICT LIABILITY 3. BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTIES

1/5/2023: Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. STRICT LIABILITY 3. BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTIES

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/5/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Related Case

1/6/2023: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/6/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2023
  • Hearing06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Dana N Meyers (Attorney): Middle Name: N

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR SUBROGATION 1. NEGLIGENCE 2. STRICT LIABILITY 3. BREACH OF EXPRESS AND IMPLIED WARRANTIES; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robinson Helicopter Company, Incorporated (Defendant); Genesys Aerosystems Group, Inc. (Defendant); Moog, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robinson Helicopter Company, Incorporated (Defendant); Genesys Aerosystems Group, Inc. (Defendant); Moog, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Harco National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Robinson Helicopter Company, Incorporated (Defendant); Genesys Aerosystems Group, Inc. (Defendant); Moog, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less