This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2022 at 09:20:10 (UTC).

HAOCHANG ZHENG VS L.A.C.M.T.A.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2020 HAOCHANG ZHENG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against L A C M T A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7190

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZHENG HAOCHANG

Defendant

L.A.C.M.T.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUANG JIANWEI .

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS ALLEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

2/21/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/3/2020: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING FSC AND TRIAL

7/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER CONTINUING FSC AND TRIAL

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

6/28/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/30/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

11/16/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

12/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION

10/18/2021: Notice - PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS INFORMATION

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • Hearing02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Hearing10/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • Hearing10/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff's Notice of Disclosure of Expert Witness Information; Filed by HAOCHANG ZHENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order Continuing FSC and Trial); Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority Erroneously Sued As L.A.C.M.T.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority Erroneously Sued As L.A.C.M.T.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transportation Authority Erroneously Sued As L.A.C.M.T.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HAOCHANG ZHENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HAOCHANG ZHENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HAOCHANG ZHENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HAOCHANG ZHENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HAOCHANG ZHENG (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LACMTA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS ALLEN