This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/16/2023 at 04:51:14 (UTC).

HAO, XIANWEN VS SONG, ZHE

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 HAO, XIANWEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SONG, ZHE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0946

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAO XIANWEN

Respondent

SONG ZHE

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/31/2022: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/31/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/31/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/31/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons

8/1/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/1/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

12/12/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

12/12/2022: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Request - Enter Default FL165 - Mailed to Respondent on 12/13/2022

12/12/2022: Request - Enter Default FL165 - Mailed to Respondent on 12/13/2022

Declaration - Default FL170

12/20/2022: Declaration - Default FL170

Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

12/20/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

12/20/2022: Proposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

Judgment

12/23/2022: Judgment

Notice - Entry of Judgment

12/23/2022: Notice - Entry of Judgment

Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

12/27/2022: Notice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice - Withdrawal of Attorney of Record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice - Entry of Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketJudgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 190 - Notice of Entry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketProposed Judgment - FL 180 - Stipulated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165 (Mailed to Respondent on 12/13/2022 ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less