This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/13/2022 at 06:31:10 (UTC).

HAO, XIANWEN VS SONG, ZHE

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 HAO, XIANWEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SONG, ZHE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0946

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAO XIANWEN

Respondent

SONG ZHE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'YOUNG MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

Summons

5/31/2022: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

5/31/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

5/31/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - UCCJEA

5/31/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Proof of Service of Summons

8/1/2022: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/1/2022: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'YOUNG MICHAEL