This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 04:07:47 (UTC).

HAO LIN, ET AL. VS JHOON, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 HAO LIN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against JHOON, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA A. MEIERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8340

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA A. MEIERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GONZALEZ ENRIQUE

LIN HAO

MARTINEZ GREGORIO EMILIO

Defendants

JHOON INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KOO KEVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARLIS BRENT PHILIP

PARK YOUNG K

Defendant Attorney

MYUNG S. CALVIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Mail

8/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

8/13/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 08/13/2021

8/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER) OF 08/13/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

8/3/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/25/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

9/13/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/20/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/17/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

12/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/22/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • Hearing01/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JHOON, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); KEVIN KOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JHOON, INC., a California corporation (Defendant); KEVIN KOO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer) of 08/13/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Peremptory Challenge to Judicial Officer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HAO LIN (Plaintiff); ENRIQUE GONZALEZ (Plaintiff); EMILIO MARTINEZ GREGORIO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MYUNG S. CALVIN