This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2022 at 10:15:36 (UTC).

HANY DEMIAN, ET AL. VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 HANY DEMIAN, filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5089

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEMIAN BERNADETTE

DEMIAN HANY

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLIN STEPHANIE ELYSE

Defendant Attorneys

RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND

HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FEES

8/29/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF POSTING COMPLEX DESIGNATION FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

7/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL ALL ATTYS FOR STR...)

Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

7/19/2022: Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

6/3/2022: Order - ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

7/11/2022: Answer

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SOPHIA

5/17/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR SOPHIA

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/19/2022: Petition to Coordinate Add-On Case (JCCP) - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/19/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

5/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF CRAIG A. FLIGOR IN SUPPORT OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S PETITION TO COORDINATE ADD-ON CASE

Proof of Service by Mail

6/10/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail

6/10/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION JOHN HUESTON

6/10/2022: Unknown - NOTICE RE: ADD-ON PETITION JOHN HUESTON

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/6/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2022
  • Hearing09/27/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting Complex Designation Fees; Filed by Hany Demian (Plaintiff); Bernadette Demian (Plaintiff); Isabelle Demian (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10; Further Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 10; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 10; Further Status Conference - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel all attys for Str...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Add-On Petition (NOTICE OF ORDER RE: PETITION FOR COORDINATION OF ADD-ON CASE); Filed by Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Christian); Filed by Hany Demian (Plaintiff); Bernadette Demian (Plaintiff); Isabelle Demian (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Isabelle); Filed by Hany Demian (Plaintiff); Bernadette Demian (Plaintiff); Isabelle Demian (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hany Demian (Plaintiff); Bernadette Demian (Plaintiff); Isabelle Demian (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hany Demian (Plaintiff); Bernadette Demian (Plaintiff); Isabelle Demian (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hany Demian (Plaintiff); Bernadette Demian (Plaintiff); Isabelle Demian (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUESTON JOHN CHARLES

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RECK BELYNDA BRIDGELAND