This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/12/2021 at 14:38:07 (UTC).

HANSEN, FELIZARDO VS GONZALEZ, BERTHA A

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 HANSEN, FELIZARDO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GONZALEZ, BERTHA A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1007

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HANSEN FELIZARDO

Respondent

GONZALEZ BERTHA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ABDOLHOSSEINI TINA H.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service of Summons - Summons and Petition, Family Law Case Cover Sheet, Notice of Case Assignment

8/18/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Summons and Petition, Family Law Case Cover Sheet, Notice of Case Assignment

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/27/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Proof of Service - Mail

9/7/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

9/7/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/24/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

6/24/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Notice - Case Assignment

6/24/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/24/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/24/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

6/24/2021: Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Summons and Petition, Family Law Case Cover Sheet, Notice of Case Assignment ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TINA ABDOLHOSSEINI H.