This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2020 at 21:40:25 (UTC).

HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE.VS. CITY OF LONG BEACH

Case Summary

On 03/01/2018 HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against CITY OF LONG BEACH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL P. VICENCIA and MARK C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1663

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

MARK C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF

442 OCEAN APT LLC

442 OCEAN APT OWNER LLC

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

CITY OF LONG BEACH

DOES 1 THROUGH 25

ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

UNITED STORM WATER INC.

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION CORPORATION

GREENWICH INSURANCE COMPANY

442 OCEAN APT OWNER LLC

MOES 1 THROUGH 40 INCLUSIVE

ALLIED SUBCONTRACTORS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

EVERAKES JORDAN

HENDRICKS JOHN CHARLES

GROTEFELD HOFFMANN (MAURA WALSH OCHOA)

OCHOA GROTEFELD HOFFMANN MAURA WALSH

OCHOA MAURA WALSH

Attorney at Grotefeld Hoffman

700 Larkspur Landing Circle Suite 280

Larkspur, CA 94939

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

THEODORE B. ZINGER

CHARLES PARKIN

Attorney at City Attorney

333 W. Ocean Blvd, 11Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

PARKIN CHARLES

ZINGER THEODORE B.

ZINGER THEODORE B

VIGUS TODD

PAGE JASON

EVERAKES JORDAN

CLINTON DAVID ALLEN

CALVAGNA JOHN JOSEPH

BREUCOP PAUL AARON

LOH ALEXANDER

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

PAGE JASON

BREUCOP PAUL AARON

LOH ALEXANDER

HENDRICKS JOHN CHARLES

ROSVALL ROBERT LAWRENCE

LOH ALEXANDER A.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Answer

10/19/2020: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

3/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/17/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

2/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

10/4/2018: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED CROSS COMPLAINT (1ST)

Cross-Complaint - (AMENDED)

10/4/2018: Cross-Complaint - (AMENDED)

Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/21/2020: Motion for Leave to Amend - MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

Answer

9/4/2019: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON APRIL 24, 2019

5/15/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT ENTERED ON APRIL 24, 2019

Order - Order for Stipulation to Extend the Time for 442 Ocean Apt Owner, LLC to Respond to City of Long Beach's Cross-Complaint

11/26/2018: Order - Order for Stipulation to Extend the Time for 442 Ocean Apt Owner, LLC to Respond to City of Long Beach's Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

12/5/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

9/18/2018: Summons - Summons on Cross Complaint

Notice of Ruling -

9/21/2018: Notice of Ruling -

Notice - Notice Of Entry of Order On Stipulation and Order To Consolidate Matters and Continue All Dates

12/12/2018: Notice - Notice Of Entry of Order On Stipulation and Order To Consolidate Matters and Continue All Dates

Legacy Document -

3/28/2018: Legacy Document -

Case Management Statement -

7/12/2018: Case Management Statement -

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • Hearing04/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • Hearing04/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Hearing02/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Hearing01/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department S27 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UNITED STORM WATER, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by UNITED STORM WATER, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by UNITED STORM WATER, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketMotion to Compel (NOTICE OF MOTION AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, SET TWO TO CROSS-DEFENDANT SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, L.P. AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE SUM OF $2,035.00; DECLARATION OF ALEXANDER A. L); Filed by UNITED STORM WATER, INC. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department S26; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv.; OSC Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CITY OF LONG BEACH (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • DocketRtn of Service of Summons & Compl; Filed by 442 OCEAN APT, LLC (Plaintiff); HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by 442 OCEAN APT, LLC (Plaintiff); HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketOrder (To Show Cause Hearing); Filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by 442 OCEAN APT, LLC (Plaintiff); HANOVER INSURANCE COMPANY AS SUBROGEE OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: NC061663    Hearing Date: October 01, 2020    Dept: S27

  1. Background Facts

    NC061663 and NC062002 are consolidated cases arising out of water damage to the physical property owned by 442 Ocean Apt, LLC and insured by Hanover Insurance Company. The complaints are only pled against the City of Long Beach. The City, however, has cross-complained against United Storm Water, Inc. and Greenwich Insurance Company for indemnification and related claims.

  2. Motions to Amend Complaints

    On 1/21/20, Hanover filed and served a motion for leave to add a negligence cause of action against United Storm Water, Inc. to its complaint. The moving papers include proof of service showing Hanover mailed the papers to all parties to the action on 1/21/20. The hearing on the motion was set for 4/07/20.

    On 3/23/20, 442 Ocean Apt Owner, LLC filed a motion for leave to add a negligence cause of action against United Storm Water, Inc. to its complaint. 442 did not include a proof of service with its moving papers. 442’s motion was scheduled for hearing on 6/18/20.

    On 3/17/20, the Court issued a minute order continuing the hearing on Hanover’s motion from 4/07/20 to 6/18/20. On 4/10/20, the Court issued a minute order continuing the 6/18/20 hearing on the two motions to 10/01/20. The 4/10/20 minute order including an indication that Plaintiff was to give notice, and a certificate of mailing showed that the Clerk gave Plaintiff notice via mail to Maura Walsh Ochoa of Grotefeld Hoffmann Gordon Ochoa & Evinger LLP at 700 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 280, Larkspur, CA 94939; this is the address for the attorneys of record for Plaintiff, Hanover.

    To date, Plaintiff has not filed any notice or proof of service showing any notice of the continued hearing date was given. The motions are therefore summarily denied. If Plaintiffs renew their motions, they must file proof of service of the moving papers.

    Plaintiffs are ordered to give notice.

    Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at gdcdepts27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative. If any party does not submit on the tentative, the party should make arrangements to appear remotely at the hearing on this matter.