This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 10:50:05 (UTC).

HANNAH ENGLANDER, ET AL. VS EDDIE FIELDS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 HANNAH ENGLANDER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDDIE FIELDS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7836

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ENGLANDER MARK

ENGLANDER HANNAH

Defendants

FIELDS EDDIE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ENVIRONMENTAL INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEARNS MATTHEW ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SHAYNE JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/1/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

10/14/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/4/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

3/24/2021: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by HANNAH ENGLANDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by HANNAH ENGLANDER (Plaintiff); MARK ENGLANDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by HANNAH ENGLANDER (Plaintiff); MARK ENGLANDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by HANNAH ENGLANDER (Plaintiff); MARK ENGLANDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by HANNAH ENGLANDER (Plaintiff); MARK ENGLANDER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shayne, Joshua