This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2023 at 07:51:56 (UTC).

HANMI BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, A NEW YORK CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/27/2022 HANMI BANK, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, A NEW YORK CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0174

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANMI BANK

Defendant

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK DANIEL E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

12/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

12/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/20/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/14/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/21/2023: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE CASE REASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • Hearing04/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice Case Reassignment and Case Management Conference; Filed by: Hanmi Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hanmi Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant); Service Date: 12/28/2022; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 40 - Hon. Anne Richardsoneffective 02/14/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Hanmi Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hanmi Bank (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant); Service Date: 12/28/2022; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: As To Parties changed from JPMorgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation (Defendant) to JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Civil Case Cover Sheet: As To Parties changed from JPMorgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation (Defendant) to JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint: As To Parties changed from JPMorgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation (Defendant) to JPMorgan Chase Bank (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hanmi Bank, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. David Sotelo in Department 40 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hanmi Bank, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hanmi Bank, a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: JPMorgan Chase Bank, a New York Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less