This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/07/2023 at 14:09:58 (UTC).

HANMI BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION VS THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP

Case Summary

On 09/08/2021 HANMI BANK, A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ALAN S. ROSENFIELD and COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1146

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ALAN S. ROSENFIELD

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANMI BANK A CALIFORNIA BANKING CORPORATION

Defendants

MADISON REALTY EQUITIES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY AND GENERAL PARTNER OF THE COTTAGES AT ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS LP

THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS LP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIBERI SANDRA

 

Court Documents

Affidavit for Order for Appearance and Examination of a Third Person

1/9/2023: Affidavit for Order for Appearance and Examination of a Third Person

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/9/2023: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

10/14/2022: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

10/14/2022: Writ of Execution - WRIT OF EXECUTION (LOS ANGELES)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

10/13/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

9/22/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

9/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING)

Judgment

9/22/2022: Judgment

Case Management Statement

9/12/2022: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...)

8/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFE...)

Request for Dismissal

7/21/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

7/21/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Case Management Statement

7/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/1/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2023
  • Hearing03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 03/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff); As to: MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC, a California limited liability company and general partner of The Cottages of Artesia Gardens Acquisitions, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketAffidavit for Order for Appearance and Examination of a Third Person; Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC, a California limited liability company and general partner of The Cottages at Artesia Gardens Acquisitions, LP (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC, a California limited liability company and general partner of The Cottages at Artesia Gardens Acquisitions, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership (Defendant); MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC, a California limited liability company and general partner of The Cottages at Artesia Gardens Acquisitions, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation against Defendant THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP, a California limited partnership and Defendant MADISON REALTY EQUITIES, LLC, a California limited liability company and general partner of The Cottages at Artesia Gardens Acquisitions, LP on the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation on 05/02/2022 for damages of $26,088.00, attorney fees of $1,172.64, and costs of $638.91 for a total of $27,899.55.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ralph C. Hofer in Department D Glendale Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HANMI BANK, a California banking corporation (Plaintiff); As to: THE COTTAGES OF ARTESIA GARDENS ACQUISITIONS, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Glendale Courthouse at Department D

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less