This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2022 at 02:28:24 (UTC).

HANKEY INVESTMENT COMPANY, LP VS JOSEPH SCHRAGE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/02/2019 HANKEY INVESTMENT COMPANY, LP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JOSEPH SCHRAGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5257

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANKEY INVESTMENT COMPANY LP

Defendants

SCHRAGE MICHAEL

SCHRAGE JOSEPH

SAGE VERMONT LLC

ESTATE OF JOSEPH SCHRAGE

Not Classified By Court

STATE COURT RECEIVER BYRON Z. MOLDO ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT SAGE VERMONT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERARDINO STEVEN

Defendant and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

TARLOW DAVID NATHAN

WAIER RANDALL

 

Court Documents

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISH ADMITTED MATTERS BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL SCHRAGE

8/9/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISH ADMITTED MATTERS BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL SCHRAGE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

8/9/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

8/9/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF NONPARTY WITNESS BYRON MOLDO

8/9/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF NONPARTY WITNESS BYRON MOLDO

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RANDALL S. WAIER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 2 AND 4

8/12/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RANDALL S. WAIER IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE NOS. 2 AND 4

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/13/2022

6/13/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/13/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/2/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Substitution of Attorney

4/14/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JUSTUS BALENTINE CSR#13859

3/21/2022: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE JUSTUS BALENTINE CSR#13859

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (SELF REPRESENTED))

3/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (JURY TRIAL (SELF REPRESENTED))

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED JOINT

3/18/2022: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST AMENDED JOINT

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/14/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AMENDED NOTICE OF RULING RE FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF ANY DEFENSE EXPERT

2/28/2022: Motion in Limine - MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE AND TESTIMONY OF ANY DEFENSE EXPERT

Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE JOINT

2/28/2022: Statement of the Case - STATEMENT OF THE CASE JOINT

Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT

2/28/2022: Exhibit List - EXHIBIT LIST JOINT

Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT

2/28/2022: Witness List - WITNESS LIST JOINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (SELF REPRESENTED)) OF 03/07/2022

3/7/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE (SELF REPRESENTED)) OF 03/07/2022

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • Hearing08/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Randall S. Waier in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions in Limine Nos. 2 and 4); Filed by Michael Schrage (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMotion in Limine (NO. 4 TO PRECLUDE TESTIMONY AND EVIDENCE OF NONPARTY WITNESS BYRON MOLDO); Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMotion in Limine (NO. 2 TO PRECLUDE EVIDENCE NOT PRODUCED IN DISCOVERY); Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketMotion in Limine (NO. 3 TO CONCLUSIVELY ESTABLISH ADMITTED MATTERS BY DEFENDANT MICHAEL SCHRAGE); Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department STL-E; MSC Timeslot (Judge Zaven V. Sinanian)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2019
  • Docketamended complaint; Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on 1st amended complaint); Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hankey Investment Company, LP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAGE VERMONT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HANKEY INVESTMENT COMPANY LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TARLOW DAVID N.