This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2022 at 07:45:22 (UTC).

HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS NICHOLAS A. KEROS

Case Summary

On 08/24/2020 HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NICHOLAS A KEROS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2134

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANKEY CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

KEROS NICHOLAS A.

TANAGER NK LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERARDINO STEVEN R.

Defendant Attorney

HURON JEFFREY G.

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

8/4/2021: Proof of Publication

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

9/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Appearance

9/10/2021: Notice of Appearance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECON...)

9/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECON...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

9/14/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECON...) OF 09/14/2021

9/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECON...) OF 09/14/2021

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

9/15/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (2ND)

Case Management Statement

9/23/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

10/20/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF THI HOANG HO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF THI HOANG HO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

10/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Settlement

11/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;) OF 11/08/2021

11/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;) OF 11/08/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE;)

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR; NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

11/17/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEMURRER OFF CALENDAR; NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (- NOT ENTERED); Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Taking Case Management Conference and Demurrer off Calendar; Notice of Order to Show Cause); Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 1:45 PM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;) of 11/08/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Richard Scott, Steven Berardino and Beverly Langworthy in Support of Application for Publication); Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HANKEY CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERARDINO STEVEN REED