This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/04/2022 at 14:37:50 (UTC).

HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS BRETT C. HARRISON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BRETT C HARRISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MONICA BACHNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6749

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MONICA BACHNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HANKEY CAPITAL LLC

Defendants

BCH ENTERPRISES LLC

HARRISON BRETT C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BERARDINO STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

HOEFFLIN RICHARD MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

6/17/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC, TO SP...)

6/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, HANKEY CAPITAL, LLC, TO SP...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC, TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF HANKEY CAPITAL, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/15/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC, TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF HANKEY CAPITAL, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RICHARD M. HOEFFLINE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC, TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF HANKEY CAP

6/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF RICHARD M. HOEFFLINE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BCH ENTERPRISES, LLC, TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFF HANKEY CAP

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

6/15/2022: Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YING LU

6/15/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YING LU

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

6/15/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO SPECIALLY SET HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGEMENT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

6/7/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Substitution of Attorney

6/7/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA HANKEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF PATRICIA HANKEY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF EUGENE LYDIKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF EUGENE LYDIKER IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Separate Statement

6/7/2022: Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

6/7/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF YING LU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/7/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF YING LU IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/7/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION RMH RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

6/1/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION RMH RE OSC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

Notice of Change of Firm Name

1/26/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice - NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

3/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • Hearing03/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • Hearing02/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • Hearing11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • Hearing09/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: for Defendant's Counsel's Failure to Appear on April 11, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 71, Monica Bachner, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Specially Set Hearing Date on Motion for Summary Judgment) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Ex Parte Application of Plaintiff, Hankey Capital, LLC, to Sp...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hankey Capital, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BCH ENTERPRISES LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HANKEY CAPITAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERARDINO STEVEN REED