This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 15:42:12 (UTC).

HANH DO THI MY VS ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 HANH DO THI MY filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DALILA CORRAL LYONS, MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF and RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1256

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DALILA CORRAL LYONS

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

THI MY HANH DO

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendants and Respondents

ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP

FREEBURG & NETTELS LAW FIRM

SILVER LAKE MEDICAL CENTER DBA SUCCESS HEALTH CARE A CORPORATION

GLENN CASPER T. M.D.

MIKULAK STEPHEN A. M.D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

NETTELS CHARLES FREDRICK

AGRUSA LISA

WONG LAWRENCE DAVID

SHAYNE JOSHUA

POTTER NANCY

WEBER JOHN J

 

Court Documents

Judgment

7/25/2022: Judgment

Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO YORK'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

7/25/2022: Response - RESPONSE PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO YORK'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SAC

8/2/2022: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF SAC

Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT STEPHEN A MIKULAK, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/2/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT STEPHEN A MIKULAK, M.D. TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEMURRER AND AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE

8/3/2022: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO AMENDED DEMURRER AND AMENDED MOTION TO STRIKE

Motion for Summary Judgment

8/4/2022: Motion for Summary Judgment

Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND S DEMURRER MOTION OF DEFENDANT MIKULAK

8/5/2022: Reply - REPLY PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND S DEMURRER MOTION OF DEFENDANT MIKULAK

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF THE PENDING HIGHER COURT ORDER, INQUIRE THIS HON COURT FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING WITH APPRECATION

8/5/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION NOTICE OF THE PENDING HIGHER COURT ORDER, INQUIRE THIS HON COURT FOR JURY TRIAL SETTING WITH APPRECATION

Unknown - REPLY TO ADD-ON PETITION PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND S DEMURRER MOTION OF DEFENDANT YORK RISK

8/5/2022: Unknown - REPLY TO ADD-ON PETITION PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE OF MOTION TO STRIKE AND S DEMURRER MOTION OF DEFENDANT YORK RISK

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION T...)

8/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION T...)

Request for Dismissal

8/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

8/9/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling

8/9/2022: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT YORK RISK SERVICES GROUPS AMENDED DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF HANH DO THI MYS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/10/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT YORK RISK SERVICES GROUPS AMENDED DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF HANH DO THI MYS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT, CASPER T. GLENN, M.D.

8/11/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT, CASPER T. GLENN, M.D.

Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN A. MIKULAK, M.D.

8/15/2022: Order - ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN A. MIKULAK, M.D.

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

8/15/2022: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY

Judgment

8/15/2022: Judgment

191 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOrder OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN A. MIKULAK, M.D. Signed and Filed by: Stephen A. Mikulak, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Stephen A. Mikulak, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT STEPHEN A. MIKULAK, M.D.: Filed By: Stephen A. Mikulak, M.D. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketOrder [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY; Signed and Filed by: Arch Insurance Company (Defendant); As to: Hanh Do Thi My (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Order [PROPOSED] ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY: Filed By: Arch Insurance Company (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: York Risk Services Group (Defendant); As to: Hanh Do Thi My (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: Filed By: York Risk Services Group (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 08/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • DocketNotice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT, CASPER T. GLENN, M.D. Filed by: Casper T. Glenn, M.D. (Defendant); As to: Hanh Do Thi My (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling ON DEFENDANT YORK RISK SERVICES GROUPS AMENDED DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF HANH DO THI MYS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Filed by: York Risk Services Group (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order SUMMARY JUDGMENT scheduled for 11/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: Filed By: Arch Insurance Company (Defendant); Result: Sustained without Leave to Amend; Result Date: 08/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
354 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hanh Do Thi My (Plaintiff); As to: Hanh Do Thi My (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Hanh Do Thi My (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hanh Do Thi My (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st): Status Date changed from 12/14/2018 to 10/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint 2nd: Status Date changed from 03/15/2019 to 10/18/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Arch Insurance Comp (Defendant): First Name: blank; Last Name: blank; Organization Name: Arch Insurance Comp; Middle Name: blank

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Docket** Case Name changed from HANH DO THI MY vs HANH DO THI MY, et al. to HANH DO THI MY vs ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY, et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER LAKE MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where YORK RISK SERVICES GROUP, INC., a foreign corporat is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGRUSA LISA