This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2022 at 14:09:11 (UTC).

HAN MOELJADI, ET AL. VS BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE SOLUTIONS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 HAN MOELJADI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE SOLUTIONS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3990

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

832 LLC

MOELJADI BRIAN C

MOELJADI EVIE T

MOELJADI GABY

MOELJADI HAN

Defendants

BOSCH AUTOMOTIVE SERVICE SOLUTIONS INC.

CORDELL PETE DBA CORDELL ELECTRIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRESSMAN CHARLES ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/29/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

7/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2024
  • Hearing06/25/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • Hearing12/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Han Moeljadi (Plaintiff); Evie T Moeljadi (Plaintiff); Gaby Moeljadi (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Han Moeljadi (Plaintiff); Evie T Moeljadi (Plaintiff); Gaby Moeljadi (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Han Moeljadi (Plaintiff); Evie T Moeljadi (Plaintiff); Gaby Moeljadi (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bosch Automotive Service Solutions LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRESSMAN CHARLES