This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 14:00:13 (UTC).

HAMMY INDUSTRIES, LLC VS DANIEL BOOTER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 HAMMY INDUSTRIES, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DANIEL BOOTER,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9428

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAMMY INDUSTRIES LLC

Defendants

ZAFAR SHAHZAIB ALI

KHAN ABDUS SALAM

BOOTER DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODMAN SHOLOM Y.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/24/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/24/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/24/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/24/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/15/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

8/25/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

Substitution of Attorney

11/9/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)]

11/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

10/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 10/25/2021, { *A COPY OF LASC MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO

10/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 10/25/2021, { *A COPY OF LASC MINUTE ORDER ISSUED THIS DATE IS ATTACHED TO

Request for Dismissal

11/22/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Hammy Industries, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hammy Industries, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 10/25/2021, { *A copy of LASC Minute Order issued this date is attached to the Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. }); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT); Filed by Daniel Booter (Defendant); Abdus Salam Khan (Defendant); Shahzaib Ali Zafar (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hammy Industries, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hammy Industries, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hammy Industries, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hammy Industries, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less