This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 15:16:49 (UTC).

HAMBRICK, BRIANNA NICOLE - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 03/03/2020 HAMBRICK, BRIANNA NICOLE - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LUNA, ANA MARIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2108

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LUNA, ANA MARIA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HAMBRICK NICOLE

Respondent

COCHLEAR AMERICAS CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ALCH THOMAS STEVEN

Respondent Attorney

ROBERTS MICHELLE LYNN

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte - Application - JOINT MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL-appearing 03/05/2020

3/3/2020: Ex Parte - Application - JOINT MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL-appearing 03/05/2020

Ex Parte - Order - Order Granting Joint Motion To File under Seal Petition and Order for Compromise of Minor's Claim by Redaction

3/5/2020: Ex Parte - Order - Order Granting Joint Motion To File under Seal Petition and Order for Compromise of Minor's Claim by Redaction

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) - REDACTED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE

3/10/2020: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) - REDACTED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

5/26/2020: Notice - Continuance - Notice of Continuance

Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone

5/19/2020: Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone

Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Defendant Cochlear Americas Corporation's Notice of Courtcall Telephonic Appearance

5/18/2020: Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Defendant Cochlear Americas Corporation's Notice of Courtcall Telephonic Appearance

Minute Order

5/18/2020: Minute Order

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - SIGNED REDACTED ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE

8/17/2020: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim - SIGNED REDACTED ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Minute Order

8/14/2020: Minute Order

Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Defendant Cochlear Americas Corporation s Notice Of Telephonic Appearance

8/6/2020: Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone - Defendant Cochlear Americas Corporation s Notice Of Telephonic Appearance

Minute Order

10/9/2020: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNotice - Lodging (Notice of OSC of Purchase of Annuity and Receipt of Settlement Funds ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid V; Filed by Minor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (SIGNED REDACTED ORDER APPROVING MINOR'S COMPROMISE ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Minor's Compromise Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketNotice - Continuance (Notice of Continuance ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice - Intent to Appear by Telephone (Notice - Intent to Appear by Telephone ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • Docketin Probate Department 79, Luna, Ana Maria, Presiding; Court Order Hearing - Advanced - Previous Date & Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • DocketNotice - Intent to Appear by Telephone (Defendant Cochlear Americas Corporation's Notice of Courtcall Telephonic Appearance ); Filed by Respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) (UNREDACTED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise - (Subsequent) (REDACTED PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR'S COMPROMISE ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Order (Order Granting Joint Motion To File under Seal Petition and Order for Compromise of Minor's Claim by Redaction ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010) (Probate Case Coversheet (Initial Subsequent) ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Application (JOINT MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL-appearing 03/05/2020 ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COCHLEAR AMERICAS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS MICHELLE LYNN