This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/05/2022 at 18:48:23 (UTC).

HALLMAN, LENORA ELIZABETH - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 09/01/2021 HALLMAN, LENORA ELIZABETH - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PENNY, BRENDA J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8570

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PENNY, BRENDA J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HALLMAN STANLEY JOE

Decedent

HALLMAN LENORA ELIZABETH

Not Classified By Court

ACEVEDO CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

RODRIGUEZ RENAY GRACE

 

Court Documents

Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

9/1/2021: Petition - Letters of Administration (Initial)

Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

9/15/2021: Proof of Publication - Proof of Publication

Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

9/10/2021: Notice - Petition to Administer Estate

Miscellaneous Document

10/12/2021: Miscellaneous Document

PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

10/20/2021: PR_General Probate - PR-Notice- Rejection

Minute Order

10/18/2021: Minute Order

Bond - suretec

11/10/2021: Bond - suretec

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

11/5/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Letters (Initial)

11/4/2021: Letters (Initial)

Order - Appointing Personal Representative

11/1/2021: Order - Appointing Personal Representative

Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

10/27/2021: Duties and Liabilities - Personal Representative

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2023
  • Hearing03/27/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 4 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketBond (suretec ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketLetters (Initial); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketOrder - Appointing Personal Representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplement to Duties and Liabilities; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities - Personal Representative; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docketin Probate Department 4, Penny, Brenda J., Presiding; Appointment Hearing - Decedent's Estate - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDISP: Granted-Initial Petition-After Crt Hrg/Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketPetition Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMiscellaneous Document; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Publication (Proof of Publication ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice - Petition to Administer Estate; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketPetition - Letters of Administration (Initial); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODRIGUEZ RENAY GRACE