This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2019 at 04:56:20 (UTC).

HALLAM & HOCHBERG LLP VS CAL AGRI PRODUCTS LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 HALLAM HOCHBERG LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CAL AGRI PRODUCTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT L. HESS and JOHN P. DOYLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9760

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ROBERT L. HESS

JOHN P. DOYLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HALLAM & HOCHBERG LLP

Defendants and Respondents

KEMPER BRUCE

CAL AGRI PRODUCTS LLC

DOES 1 TO 50

WEICHERT GARDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

THE MALONEY FIRM APC

DAVIS BUD MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

FELDHAKE ROBERT JAMES

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/2/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/2/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

4/20/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

6/14/2018: NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

DECLARATION OF BUD M. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC'S RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

9/28/2018: DECLARATION OF BUD M. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC'S RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, PROPOUNDED ON DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

9/28/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION, SET ONE, PROPOUNDED ON DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

DECLARATION OF BUD M. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATOREES, SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

9/28/2018: DECLARATION OF BUD M. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATOREES, SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

DECLARATION OF BUD M. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

9/28/2018: DECLARATION OF BUD M. DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT CAL AGRI PRODUCTS, LLC'S RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE, AND FOR SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $685.00

Notice

10/3/2018: Notice

Minute Order

11/2/2018: Minute Order

Request for Dismissal

4/23/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order

4/25/2019: Minute Order

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/25/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Ruling

4/29/2019: Notice of Ruling

DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/21/2017: DECLARATION OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

11/8/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Hallam & Hochberg LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Hallam & Hochberg LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Cal Agri Products, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Cal Agri Products, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Cal Agri Products, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Cal Agri Products, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Order to Show Cause Re: (Amending to Name Doe Defendant after Dismissal of Unnamed Doe Defendants) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 58; Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy; Order to Show Cause Re: Ame...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Hallam & Hochberg LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
68 More Docket Entries
  • 11/01/2017
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-11-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Hallam & Hochberg LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CODE CIV. PROC., 170.6)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Hallam & Hochberg LLP (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC679760    Hearing Date: July 20, 2020    Dept: 58

Judge John P. Doyle

Department 58


Hearing Date: July 20, 2020

Case Name: Hallam & Hochberg, LLP v. Cal Agri Products, LLC, et al.

Case No.: BC679760

Matter: Motion to Compel

Moving Party: Plaintiff Hallam & Hochberg, LLP

Responding Party: Unopposed


Tentative Ruling: The Motion to Compel is granted.


Plaintiff Hallam & Hochberg, LLP seeks to compel responses to its judgment debtor discovery propounded upon Defendant Cal Agri Products, LLC.

Because timely responses were not provided, the Motion to Compel is granted. Responses are to be provided within twenty days. The Court respectfully declines to award sanctions.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELDHAKE ROBERT J.