This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2022 at 05:45:37 (UTC).

HAL MARCUS WEITZBUCH VS SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 HAL MARCUS WEITZBUCH filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1305

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEITZBUCH HAL MARCUS

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC. D/B/A GM FINANCIAL

SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOBASSERI ROBERT B.

Defendant Attorney

SHUGART JONATHAN M

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

4/4/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

4/4/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

4/4/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/4/2022: Complaint

Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

4/7/2022: Unknown - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/7/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer - ANSWER GENERAL MOTORS LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/24/2022: Answer - ANSWER GENERAL MOTORS LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer

5/24/2022: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/18/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/8/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/1/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

8/1/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/1/2022: Case Management Statement

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors, LLC. D/B/A GM Financial (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Silver Star Motor Car Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAnswer (GENERAL MOTORS LLC?S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF?S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT); Filed by General Motors, LLC. D/B/A GM Financial (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hal Marcus Weitzbuch (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SILVER STAR MOTOR CAR COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOBASSERI ROBERT B.