This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2021 at 15:01:00 (UTC).

HAIKANOUCH KASABIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL VS FOOD 4 LESS GM, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 HAIKANOUCH KASABIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against FOOD 4 LESS GM, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8719

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASABIAN AN INDIVIDUAL HAIKANOUCH

Defendants

FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

FOOD 4 LESS GM INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY EDWARD

 

Court Documents

Answer

6/21/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

6/2/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/26/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/18/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2024
  • Hearing05/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • Hearing11/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Food 4 Less of California, Inc. dba Food 4 Less Erroneously Sued As Food 4 Less GM, Inc, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Haikanouch Kasabian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Haikanouch Kasabian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Haikanouch Kasabian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Haikanouch Kasabian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Haikanouch Kasabian, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FOOD 4 LESS HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEOSIAN HAROUT GREG