This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2023 at 03:06:50 (UTC).

HAIGHT, BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP VS JOE MARTEN

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 HAIGHT, BROWN BONESTEEL LLP filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOE MARTEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HOLLY J. FUJIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1848

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HOLLY J. FUJIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAIGHT BROWN & BONESTEEL LLP

Defendant

MARTEN JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

IRELAND WILLIAM E.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/29/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/29/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/29/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/29/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/29/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/29/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

11/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/21/2022

11/21/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 11/21/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

11/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

3/6/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

3/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION AMENDED DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/10/2023

3/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 03/10/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

3/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • Hearing05/24/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Proof of Service/Dismissal scheduled for 05/24/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 03/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Appearance Case Review re: Proof of Service/Dismissal scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 05/24/2023 10:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDeclaration AMENDED DECLARATION OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF WILLIAM IRELAND IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re: Proof of Service/Dismissal scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 11/21/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketAddress for William E. Ireland (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Joe Marten (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Joe Marten (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Joe Marten (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Haight, Brown & Bonesteel LLP (Plaintiff); As to: Joe Marten (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Holly J. Fujie in Department 56 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less