This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 00:08:35 (UTC).

HAIG AMIRIAN VS DAVID VOLONAKIS

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 HAIG AMIRIAN filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DAVID VOLONAKIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4590

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMIRIAN HAIG

Defendant

VOLONAKIS DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KACHATOORIAN HOV

KACHATOORIAN HOV J.

Defendant Attorney

KAPLAN JONATHAN A

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/5/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

11/13/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

11/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 11/13/2020

11/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 11/13/2020

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER

12/28/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER

Answer

9/20/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/23/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/23/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/15/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Haig Amirian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER); Filed by David Volonakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:10 AM in Department 32, Stephen I. Goorvitch, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) of 11/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Haig Amirian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by David Volonakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by David Volonakis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Haig Amirian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Haig Amirian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Haig Amirian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAPLAN JONATHAN A