This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2023 at 09:57:02 (UTC).

HAI SOOK KANG VS LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2022 HAI SOOK KANG filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, A PUBLIC ENTITY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1218

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KANG HAI SOOK

Defendant

LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY A PUBLIC ENTITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHULTZ ESQ THOMAS A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/5/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/5/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/5/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/5/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/5/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/5/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 02/10/2023

2/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 02/10/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 05/04/2023

5/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...) OF 05/04/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • Hearing08/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount up to $1,500 Against Plaintiff pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 177.5 for Failure to Appear on 05/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount up to $1,500 Against Plaintiff pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 177.5 for Failure to Appear on 05/04/2023 scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...) of 05/04/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2023; Result Type to Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount up to $1,500 Against Plaintiff pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 177.5 for Failure to Appear on 02/10/2023 scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3 updated: Result Date to 05/04/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions in the Amount up to $1,500 Against Plaintiff pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 177.5 for Failure to Appear on 02/10/2023 scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 02/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Colin P. Leis in Department 3 Alhambra Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HAI SOOK KANG (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HAI SOOK KANG (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HAI SOOK KANG (Plaintiff); As to: LOS ANGELES COUNTY METROPOLITAN TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, a public entity (Defendant); DOES 1 through 50, inclusive (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department 3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less