This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:05:39 (UTC).

HADRIEN LEE VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 HADRIEN LEE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2283

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE HADRIEN

Defendant

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO MARK

Defendant Attorney

ARANI BEHROUZ SHAREGHI

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT BY DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

12/23/2021: Notice - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF CIVIL ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT BY DEFENDANT BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC

Answer

12/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • Hearing03/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketNotice (to State Court and Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC); Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW of North America, LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Hadrien Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Hadrien Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Hadrien Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Hadrien Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROMANO MARK