This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/28/2022 at 16:15:54 (UTC).

H. M., BY AND THROUGH GAL, ET AL. VS PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Case Summary

On 11/12/2021 H M , BY AND THROUGH GAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1939

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY DAYSHENELL

Defendant

PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NAIME OMAR M.

NAIME OMAR

Defendant Attorney

DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/12/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/12/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/12/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR H.M.

12/13/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR H.M.

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR H.M.

11/19/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR H.M.

PI General Order

11/19/2021: PI General Order

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/19/2021: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/22/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

3/22/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/31/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2024
  • Hearing11/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2023
  • Hearing05/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • Hearing04/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Pasadena Unified School District (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by H. M., by and through GAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by H. M., by and through GAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for H.M.); Filed by H. M., by and through GAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection of Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for H.M.); Filed by H. M., by and through GAL (Plaintiff); Dayshenell Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by H. M., by and through GAL (Plaintiff); Dayshenell Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by H. M., by and through GAL (Plaintiff); Dayshenell Murphy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PASADENA UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUMANIAN NANCY PRAPION