This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 18:35:38 (UTC).

GWENDOLYN FOSTER VS COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 GWENDOLYN FOSTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3661

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FOSTER GWENDOLYN

Defendants

COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION

COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/30/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/30/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/30/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/30/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

12/15/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/11/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2024
  • Hearing11/26/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • Hearing05/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • Hearing05/16/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Gwendolyn Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gwendolyn Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gwendolyn Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gwendolyn Foster (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE MEMBERSHIP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COSTCO WHOLESALE CORPORATION, a Washington Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AGHABALA PAYAM PAUL