This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 14:08:45 (UTC).

GUZMAN GARCIA, JUAN CARLOS VS SOTO ESQUER, ISABEL

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 GUZMAN GARCIA, JUAN CARLOS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SOTO ESQUER, ISABEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Whittier Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY, CHARLES Q.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0056

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY, CHARLES Q.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUZMAN GARCIA JUAN CARLOS

Respondent

SOTO ESQUER ISABEL

 

Court Documents

RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee) - Other: End The Restraining Order

11/16/2021: RFO/MTN - DV (No Fee) - Other: End The Restraining Order

Findings and Order to Terminate Restraining Order After Hrg

1/3/2022: Findings and Order to Terminate Restraining Order After Hrg

Minute Order

1/3/2022: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

1/19/2021: Request - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Modified 2/8/2021

1/19/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Modified 2/8/2021

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/19/2021: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/19/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/19/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service - Mail

1/26/2021: Proof of Service - Mail

Response - Domestic Violence

1/26/2021: Response - Domestic Violence

FCS-Mediation Memo

2/5/2021: FCS-Mediation Memo

Order - Talking Parents

2/8/2021: Order - Talking Parents

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Corrected 2/25/2021

2/8/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Corrected 2/25/2021

Minute Order

2/8/2021: Minute Order

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Corrected 2/25/2021

2/8/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) - Corrected 2/25/2021

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - Dismissed/terminated per 1/3/2022 court order

2/17/2021: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) - Dismissed/terminated per 1/3/2022 court order

Minute Order

2/17/2021: Minute Order

FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

1/19/2021: FL_General Family Law - FL - Order to Participate in Mediation

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2022
  • Docketat 8:32 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; RFO - DV (NO FEE) - Held - Order Made

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketFindings and Order to Terminate Restraining Order After Hrg; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketRFO/MTN - DV (No Fee) (Other: End The Restraining Order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO After Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130) (Dismissed/terminated per 1/3/2022 court order ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 202, Clay, Charles Q., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116) (Corrected 2/25/2021 ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketOrder (Talking Parents )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketResponse - Domestic Violence; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Mail; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/ Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Modified 2/8/2021 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less