This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/10/2021 at 18:16:21 (UTC).

GUY MYERS VS PILLEMER & PILLEMER, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 GUY MYERS filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against PILLEMER PILLEMER, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, KEVIN C. BRAZILE and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6615

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MYERS GUY

Defendants

PILLEMER DAVID B.

PILLEMER & PILLEMER A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PILLEMER & PILLEMER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MALONEY PATRICK MERRITT

Defendant Attorney

MAYER ZACHARY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/28/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/28/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/24/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/24/2020: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH PROBATE CASE # 20STPB04954 (LEAD) -

10/20/2020: Notice of Related Case - NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH PROBATE CASE # 20STPB04954 (LEAD) -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: MYERS V. PILLEMER & P...)

11/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: MYERS V. PILLEMER & P...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: MYERS V. PILLEMER & P...) OF 11/02/2020

11/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES: MYERS V. PILLEMER & P...) OF 11/02/2020

Demand for Jury Trial

3/19/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

3/19/2021: Answer

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/17/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

1/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Pillemer & Pillemer (Defendant); David B. Pillemer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Pillemer & Pillemer (Defendant); David B. Pillemer (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Guy Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Order Re Notice of Related Cases); Filed by Guy Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Re Notice of Related Cases20STCV36615 & 20STPB04954) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 11:25 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases: Myers v. Pillemer & P...) of 11/02/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Related Cases: Myers v. Pillemer & P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case ([Dept. 1 received 10/23/2020]); Filed by Guy Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guy Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guy Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guy Myers (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PILLEMER & PILLEMER A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYER ZACHARY