This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 02:01:11 (UTC).

GUVEN UZUN, ET AL. VS STEWART BAKER JEFFERSON POWELL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2019 GUVEN UZUN filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against STEWART BAKER JEFFERSON POWELL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9306

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

UZUN GUVEN

INFONEURO GROUP A MEDICAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

PLAYA ADVANCE URGENT CARE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

PLAYA ADVANCE SURGICAL INSTITUTE LLC

PLAYA ADVANCE URGENT CARE INC.

INFONEURO GROUP

Defendants

YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY PARTNERSHIP

YACOUBIAN TALIN V.

JEFFERSON POWELL STEWART BAKER

YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

Not Classified By Court

GARNER HEALTH LAW CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARNER CRAIG BOYD

HUNT STEVEN DAILY

Defendant Attorney

WARSHAW ROBERT GERARD

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CA...)

6/30/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CA...)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Answer

6/10/2020: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

4/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE

Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

4/17/2020: Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

4/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS]

Amended Complaint - 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/8/2020: Amended Complaint - 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO TAKE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR AND ORDER THEREON

3/20/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO TAKE DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR AND ORDER THEREON

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE AND COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR

3/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

1/27/2020: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

1/27/2020: Notice of Motion - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

1/27/2020: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

1/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING

2/13/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE ON DEFENDANTS' DEMURRERS AND MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Stewart Baker Jefferson Powell (Defendant); Yacoubian & Powell, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Playa Advance Urgent Care, Inc., (Plaintiff); Guven Uzun (Plaintiff); Playa Advance Surgical Institute, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Ca...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stewart Baker Jefferson Powell (Defendant); Yacoubian & Powell, LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Filed by Craig Boyd Garner (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketMotion to Be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by Craig Boyd Garner (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Robert G. Warshaw re Attempted Meet and Confer re Demurrer); Filed by Stewart Baker Jefferson Powell (Defendant); Yacoubian & Powell, LLP (Defendant); Talin V. Yacoubian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Guven Uzun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Guven Uzun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guven Uzun (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guven Uzun (Plaintiff); Infoneuro Group (Plaintiff); Playa Advance Surgical Institute, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guven Uzun (Plaintiff); Infoneuro Group (Plaintiff); Playa Advance Surgical Institute, LLC (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where YACOUBIAN & POWELL LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where INFONEURO GROUP A MEDICAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PLAYA ADVANCE URGENT CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where GARNER HEALTH LAW CORPORATION A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant