This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2022 at 15:29:46 (UTC).

GUSTAVO VALLADARES VS ISAAC HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/03/2022 GUSTAVO VALLADARES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ISAAC HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0661

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLADARES GUSTAVO

Defendant

ISAAC HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMENTHAL NORMAN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/5/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

8/5/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/3/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/3/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/3/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/3/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

10/31/2022: Proof of Service by Mail - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • Hearing07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Gustavo Valladares (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Holdings, Inc. (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketPost-Mediation Status Conference scheduled for 07/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Filed by: Isaac Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/29/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference (Stipulated LD 3/3/2028) scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/10/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- STIPULATION TO STAY ACTION PENDING MEDIATION; [PROPOSED] ORDER: Result Date changed from 10/18/2022 to 10/11/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Gustavo Valladares (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Gustavo Valladares (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Gustavo Valladares (Plaintiff); As to: Isaac Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISAAC HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMENTHAL NORMAN