This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2022 at 17:46:33 (UTC).

GUSTAVO VALLADARES, VS ISAAC HOLDINGS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 GUSTAVO VALLADARES, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ISAAC HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9427

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VALLADARES GUSTAVO

Defendant

ISAAC HOLDINGS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLUMENTHAL NORMAN

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

6/15/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

6/15/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

6/15/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/15/2022: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/20/2022

6/20/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/20/2022

Initial Status Conference Order

6/20/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • Hearing08/15/2022 at 1:30 PM in Department 6 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Initial Status Conference) of 06/20/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gustavo Valladares, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gustavo Valladares, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gustavo Valladares, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ISAAC HOLDINGS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLUMENTHAL NORMAN