This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/11/2021 at 07:35:15 (UTC).

GUSTAVO MELGOZA VS GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 GUSTAVO MELGOZA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4771

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELGOZA GUSTAVO

Defendant

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

KING DAVID PAUL

Other Attorneys

RABINEAU LARRY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/4/2021: Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/24/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/24/2021: PI General Order

Answer

6/2/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

5/5/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2024
  • Hearing02/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Hearing08/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • Hearing07/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Gustavo Melgoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gustavo Melgoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gustavo Melgoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gustavo Melgoza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY is a litigant