This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2019 at 12:59:17 (UTC).

GUSTAVO LOPEZ VS UULALA INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 GUSTAVO LOPEZ filed a Contract - Business Governance lawsuit against UULALA INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4604

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business Governance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

LOPEZ GUSTAVO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UULALA INC

GARCIA OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY PAUL MICHAEL ESQ.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KAMINSKI DAVID JAY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION

12/17/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

12/17/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE OSC RE DISMISSAL

12/18/2019: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE OSC RE DISMISSAL

Notice of Ruling

10/16/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

10/16/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Answer - ANSWER TO OSCAR GARCIAS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/8/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO OSCAR GARCIAS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Notice of Settlement

7/16/2019: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

7/16/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/18/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Cross-Complaint

5/30/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer - ANSWER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/30/2019: Answer - ANSWER TO FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Ruling

5/9/2019: Notice of Ruling

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE TONI FENIMORE, CSR#6661

4/25/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore - ORDER APPOINTING COURT APPROVED REPORTER AS OFFICIAL REPORTER PRO TEMPORE TONI FENIMORE, CSR#6661

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)

4/30/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (3RD)

Amended Complaint

4/30/2019: Amended Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO TALENTO UNO MUSIC LLC...)

4/26/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO TALENTO UNO MUSIC LLC...)

Reply - REPLY RE PLAINTIFF GUSTAVO LOPEZS MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO: (1) TALENTO UNO MUSIC, LLC; AND (2) UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, INC.

4/18/2019: Reply - REPLY RE PLAINTIFF GUSTAVO LOPEZS MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENAS TO: (1) TALENTO UNO MUSIC, LLC; AND (2) UNIVERSAL MUSIC GROUP, INC.

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO QUASH

4/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO QUASH

88 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (RE OSC RE DISMISSAL); Filed by Gustavo Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (RE: SETTLEMENT AND RETENTION OF JURISDICTION); Filed by Gustavo Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause - Hearing (reDismissal Date) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Gustavo Lopez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
163 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDECLARATION OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF OPERATING AGREEMENT; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Lopez, Gustavo individually and on behalf (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint; Filed by Lopez, Gustavo individually and on behalf (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint (for Damages for Breach of Operating Agreement); Filed by Lopez, Gustavo individually and on behalf (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR BREACH OF OPERATING AGREEMENT; FOR DIVERSION OF CORPORATE OPPORTUNITY; TO SET ASIDE FRAUDULENT TRANSFER; FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; FOR PRODUCTION OF RECORDS; AND FOR EXPULSION AND DISASSOCIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Lopez, Gustavo individually and on behalf (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less