Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/09/2021 at 07:55:22 (UTC).

GUSTAVO LOPEZ-ROSAS VS MARTHA PADILLA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 GUSTAVO LOPEZ-ROSAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTHA PADILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3304

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOPEZ-ROSAS GUSTAVO

Defendant

PADILLA MARTHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALEH HUSSEIN H.

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/23/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/27/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2024
  • Hearing01/24/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • Hearing07/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • Hearing07/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gustavo Lopez-Rosas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gustavo Lopez-Rosas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gustavo Lopez-Rosas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SALEH HUSSEIN H.