Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/15/2021 at 12:36:37 (UTC).

GUS TYSON, JR. VS JOAL LOPEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 GUS TYSON, JR filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOAL LOPEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9406

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYSON GUS JR.

Defendants

LOPEZ JOAL

LOPEZ STEPHANIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FITZGERALD PAUL

FITZGERALD PAUL DANA

Defendant Attorney

YOUNG EL MAHDI

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/17/2020: Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

5/15/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

5/15/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS

Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

5/15/2020: Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...) OF 05/18/2020

5/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...) OF 05/18/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

5/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTING OF MOTION PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY ORDER ...)

Notice of Motion - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; (2) COMPELLIN

6/1/2020: Notice of Motion - MOTION FOR ORDER NOTICE THAT DEFENDANTS MOTIONS FOR ORDERS: (1) COMPELLING PLAINTIFFS VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; (2) COMPELLIN

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 08/17/2020

8/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...) OF 08/17/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

8/17/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)]

8/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE RESCHEDULING HEARINGS PURSUANT TO EMERGENCY O...)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

3/26/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER] AND STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

3/26/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/19/2019: Complaint

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2022
  • Hearing03/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Hearing01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • Hearing12/17/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docketat 11:02 AM in Department 31, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Rescheduling hearings Pursuant to Emergency O...) of 08/17/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF?S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES); Filed by Joal Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order (MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PLAINTIFF?S VERIFIED RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES); Filed by Joal Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAnswer (to Complaint); Filed by Joal Lopez (Defendant); Stephanie Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Joal Lopez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gus Tyson, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gus Tyson, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gus Tyson, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOUNG EL MAHDI