This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/21/2022 at 16:55:08 (UTC).

GURPRASHAD, LLC VS TOBI MILLER

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 GURPRASHAD, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TOBI MILLER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4300

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GURPRASHAD LLC

Defendant

MILLER TOBI AKA TOBIAS MILLER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DURINGER STEPHEN C.

Defendant Attorney

BROWN AARON

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/16/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/15/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/15/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer - ANSWER GENERAL DENIAL

11/12/2021: Answer - ANSWER GENERAL DENIAL

Case Management Statement

12/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/17/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Continuance

1/11/2022: Notice of Continuance

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • Hearing02/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Continuance; Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Stephen C. Duringer (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketAnswer (GENERAL DENIAL); Filed by Tobi Miller (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gurprashad, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN AARON