This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/24/2022 at 14:01:44 (UTC).

GURINDER JIT SINGH VS DELL PRODUCTS GP LLC, DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 GURINDER JIT SINGH filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DELL PRODUCTS GP LLC, DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8349

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SINGH GURINDER JIT

Defendants

DELL PRODUCTS GP LLC DOING BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA DBA DELL PRODUCTS LP

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

FALLOON CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KNOLL JEFFREY

Defendant Attorney

LAW YUK K.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Demand for Jury Trial

12/30/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

12/30/2021: Answer

Request for Dismissal

1/6/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2024
  • Hearing10/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • Hearing04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • Hearing04/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Gurinder Jit Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Dell Products GP LLC, doing business in California (Defendant); Christopher Edward Falloon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Dell Products GP LLC, doing business in California (Defendant); Christopher Edward Falloon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Dell Products GP LLC, doing business in California (Defendant); Christopher Edward Falloon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gurinder Jit Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gurinder Jit Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gurinder Jit Singh (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dell Products, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant