This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2018 at 05:58:44 (UTC).

GURDEEP SETHI VS ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 GURDEEP SETHI filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1105

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON, JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SETHI GURDEEP

Appellant

ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ROY RAJ D.

 

Court Documents

JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGMENT HEARING DATE; ORDER

1/26/2018: JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGMENT HEARING DATE; ORDER

ROY MEDICAL GROUP'S ATTORNEY, RAJ D. ROY'S, DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

4/3/2018: ROY MEDICAL GROUP'S ATTORNEY, RAJ D. ROY'S, DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

4/9/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Minute Order

4/9/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

5/1/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

10/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

10/18/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE?CIVIL

NOTICE OF APPEAL

10/2/2017: NOTICE OF APPEAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • Notice (OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • at 08:30 am in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; OSC RE Dismissal (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED4/9/18) - Case Dismissed/Disposed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • Request (REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL ); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • Response (ROY MEDICAL GROUP'S ATTORNEY, RAJ D. ROY'S, DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ); Filed by Attorney for Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Conference-Case Management - No Appearance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • at 09:30 am in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Jr., Presiding; Conference-Case Management (continued per stipulation to2/21/18) - Matter continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Stipulation (JOINT STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING DATE; ORDER ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL UNAVAL DTS: 01/24/2018 THROUGH 02/08/2018 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Proof of Service; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Notice of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROY MEDICAL GROUP INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROY RAJ D.