This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 01:22:23 (UTC).

GUODONG YU, ET AL. VS ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 GUODONG YU filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8256

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YU GUODONG

GORDON BUSINESS PARTNERS LLC A MONTANA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

TONG PEIJI

ST EXOTICS AUTO GROUP LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WANG JEFFEY C.P.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/25/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 08/21/2020

8/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...) OF 08/21/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

8/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AS T...)

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

5/19/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/13/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Guodong Yu (Plaintiff); Gordon Business Partners, LLC, a Montana Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (As To All Named Defendants) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...) of 08/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service As T...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guodong Yu (Plaintiff); Gordon Business Partners, LLC, a Montana Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guodong Yu (Plaintiff); Gordon Business Partners, LLC, a Montana Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guodong Yu (Plaintiff); Gordon Business Partners, LLC, a Montana Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WANG JEFFREY C.P.