Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/04/2020 at 02:03:27 (UTC).

GUNILLA PERSSON VS MARION R. LITNER

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 GUNILLA PERSSON filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against MARION R LITNER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3900

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERSSON GUNILLA

Defendant

LITNER MARION R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ABB WAYNE MARK

Defendant Attorney

REAGAN BARRY JAMES

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/17/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/3/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/1/2020: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/1/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/12/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/9/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

4/9/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/9/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • Hearing06/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • Hearing06/07/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • Hearing02/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 19 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 19; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Gunilla Persson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Marion R. Litner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Marion R. Litner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Marion R. Litner (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gunilla Persson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Gunilla Persson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Gunilla Persson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Gunilla Persson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer REAGAN BARRY JAMES