This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2022 at 16:02:17 (UTC).

GUILLERMO MELENDREZ, ET AL. VS FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2022 GUILLERMO MELENDREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FORD MOTOR COMPANY, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5557

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELENDREZ GUILLERMO

MELENDREZ KEVYN

Defendants

FORD MOTOR COMPANY A DELAWARE CORPORATION

LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA CARUSO FORD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER M.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/11/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

5/11/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE]

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

5/11/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/10/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/10/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/10/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

5/10/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

5/10/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

5/10/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

5/10/2022: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2022
  • Hearing10/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 37 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guillermo Melendrez (Plaintiff); Kevyn Melendrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guillermo Melendrez (Plaintiff); Kevyn Melendrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guillermo Melendrez (Plaintiff); Kevyn Melendrez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LONG BEACH LINCOLN MERCURY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOVASZ CHRISTOPHER