This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2022 at 10:15:59 (UTC).

GUILLERMINA HERRERA, ET AL. VS NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 GUILLERMINA HERRERA, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against NORRED ASSOCIATES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4117

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERRERA GUILLERMINA

HERRERA ELIZABETH

Defendant

NORRED & ASSOCIATES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GINZBURG DANIEL V.

STARR MANNY

DONABEDIAN SAM A.

Defendant Attorneys

SBARDELLATI ANTHONY

SIEVE CAROLYN E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

3/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Request for Dismissal

3/7/2022: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE HEARING

10/25/2021: Notice of Continuance - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/27/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

7/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Request for Dismissal

3/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

5/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

11/23/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

11/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 11/06/2020

Notice of Related Case

9/15/2020: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Statement

8/3/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/05/2020

8/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 08/05/2020

Notice of Ruling

8/6/2020: Notice of Ruling

Answer

8/6/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/21/2020: Case Management Statement

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Continuance (HEARING); Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 14, Terry Green, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff); Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (2nd); Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff); Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (Second Amended); Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff); Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guillermina Herrera (Plaintiff); Elizabeth Herrera (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less