This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/25/2021 at 00:46:08 (UTC).

GUILBERT TEX INC. VS PEOPLE TREND INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 GUILBERT TEX INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PEOPLE TREND INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY KEOSIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6456

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GREGORY KEOSIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUILBERT TEX INC.

Defendants

PEOPLE TREND INC

SHARAFIAN SHAHRAM

SMASH MENS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NOVIAN FARHAD

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE REGARDING EXECUTION OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITATION AND STAY OF ACTION AND ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION ON JANUARY 19, 2022

7/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE REGARDING EXECUTION OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITATION AND STAY OF ACTION AND ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION ON JANUARY 19, 2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

7/19/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION

Case Management Statement

7/6/2021: Case Management Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION RE 30 DAY EXTENSION TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

5/25/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION RE 30 DAY EXTENSION TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/19/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

3/4/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/17/2021: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • Hearing01/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 61 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (REGARDING EXECUTION OF STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITATION AND STAY OF ACTION AND ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE RE ARBITRATION ON JANUARY 19, 2022); Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (For Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action); Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 61, Gregory Keosian, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (RE 30 DAY EXTENSION TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING); Filed by People Trend Inc (Defendant); Shahram Sharafian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Guilbert Tex Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMASH MENS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Guilbert Tex, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVIAN FARHAD