This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2023 at 13:14:24 (UTC).

GUIDE ONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 GUIDE ONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3071

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUIDE ONE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAYLAND W. DIANE

Defendant Attorney

HUESTON JOHN C

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

6/23/2023: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFE...)

4/26/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF FURTHER STATUS CONFE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE;)

3/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

2/6/2023: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Answer

1/19/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)

1/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

12/20/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

11/14/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 11/14/2022

11/14/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASE;) OF 11/14/2022

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

11/2/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION

Notice of Related Case

11/2/2022: Notice of Related Case

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/26/2022

10/26/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;) OF 10/26/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

10/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. COMPLEX DETERMINATION;)

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/17/2024

Hearing01/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023

Hearing11/08/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2023

Hearing10/18/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Readiness Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

Hearing09/06/2023 at 11:00 AM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketStatus Conference Re. Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2023

DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 07/27/2023 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 07/27/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketNon-Appearance Case Review Re. Status of Case scheduled for 06/23/2023 at 04:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2023

DocketAmended Minute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review Re. Status of Case)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
10/26/2022

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/10/2022

DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Guide One National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Guide One National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Guide One National Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less