This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2020 at 11:32:08 (UTC).

GUEVARRA, JOSEPH G. VS REDONDO, JANSSEN T.

Case Summary

On 04/09/2020 GUEVARRA, JOSEPH G filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against REDONDO, JANSSEN T. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0366

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GUEVARRA JOSEPH G.

Respondent

REDONDO JANSSEN T.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'YOUNG MICHAEL C

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/9/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Summons

4/9/2020: Summons

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

4/9/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Default FL170

8/10/2020: Declaration - Default FL170

Request - Enter Default FL165

8/10/2020: Request - Enter Default FL165

Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

8/10/2020: Stipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

Judgment Package Received - FC2336

8/10/2020: Judgment Package Received - FC2336

Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

6/22/2020: Notice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition

Proof of Service of Summons

6/22/2020: Proof of Service of Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less